THE DODDINGTON HALL CONSERVATION CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public regarding conservation of artworks, heritage and natural environment at the Doddington Estate. To promote the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment on the Doddington Estate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 03 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE VICTORIA BIRCH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lucy Lapwing | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason O'Rourke | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma Tatlow | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Frances Mary Powell | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Brainerd | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.08k | £0 | £1.64k | £175.25k | £67.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.50k | £288 | £1.80k | £177.02k | £72.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 MAY 2006Q AS AMENDED ON 16 NOV 2022 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOV 2023 as amended on 23 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
The trustees must apply the income of the charity in furthering the following objects (“the objects”): (a) the advancement of education, in particular: (i) of the public in relation to the physical and natural environment and heritage assets on the Doddington Estate; and (ii) of young people in connection with the environment; (b) the advancement of health and recreation of the public in the interests of social welfare, in particular by providing public access to parts of the Doddington Estate; (c) the advancement of community development in the vicinity of the Doddington Estate; (d) the advancement of the arts, culture, heritage or science for the public benefit, in particular by the conservation, protection and improvement of heritage assets on the Doddington Estate; and (e) the advancement of environmental protection or improvement for the public benefit, in particular of the natural environment on the Doddington Estate, (f) where references in this clause to “in particular” shall be construed to include “but without limitation to”.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LINCOLN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Doddington Hall
Doddington
LINCOLN
LN6 4RU
- Phone:
- 01522683537
- Email:
- info@doddingtonhall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window