FEPA UK - EGLISE NZAMBE MALAMU - BRIXTON BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General purposes, education and training. Relief of poverty, overseas aid/famine relief, religious activities, arts/culture, sport/recreation accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 July 2006: Standard registration
- EFEP CENTRE (Working name)
- EFEP UK (Working name)
- THE EGLISE DE LA FRATERNITE EVANGELIQUE DE PENTACOTE - EFEP UK (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr J SEFINI | Chair | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MISS M ZUMBU | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR S M Munongo | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR M MACULOCOXI | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS K MPIA | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MBANGALA MUNONGO | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS K MBONGO | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS J MPOWA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £9.20k | £12.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.80k | £0 | £8.60k | £11.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2021 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC FROM THE DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF CONGO LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. 1) TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND RAISE AWARENESS OF GOD'S WORDS EXTRACTED FROM THE BIBLE AND 2) TO MANAGE AND PROMOTE YOUTH MINISTRY 3) TO ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST IN SETTING UP OF OTHER CHAPELS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM 4) TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL BENEFIT AND WELFARE OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, HOME WORK CLUBS AND SATURDAY SUPPLEMENTARY CLASSES, JUST TO MENTION BUT A FEW 5) TO ORGANISING EVENTS AND CONFERENCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY 6) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS, HARDSHIPS AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE BY SETTING UP PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DIFFERENT SERVICES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 28
Acland House
Stockwell Gardens Estate
London
SW9 9AD
- Phone:
- 07951732587
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window