Accounts and annual returns MILTON KEYNES REIKI CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1115912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 July 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required