Governing document CIVIL AIR SUPPORT

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 18 FEBRUARY 2006, 18 NOVEMBER 2007 AND 15 DECEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED ON 27 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PEOPLE, PROPERTY AND THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE USE OF AERIAL OBSERVATION OVER LAND AND WATER, IN ORDER TO IDENTIFY SITUATIONS WHERE PEOPLE AND / OR PROPERTY AND/OR THE ENVIRONMENT IS AT RISK AND BY WORKING WITH SUCH OTHER BODIES AS DEEMED APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.