DURHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 09 January 2006: Standard registration
- 23 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DURHAM CAB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.00k | £278.97k | £216.24k | £181.04k | £254.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £185.05k | £256.73k | £197.71k | £167.33k | £248.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | 23 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | 23 December 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 22 April 2013 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 26 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN DURHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
DURHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window