HAWTHORNE PARK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HAWTHORNE PARK TRUST EXISTS TO DEVELOP AND OVERSEE A PARK WITHIN THE BUILT UP AREA OF THORNTON. ONCE AN ILL DRAINED FIELD, THE TRUST IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHERS HAS CREATED A COMMUNITY PARK AND WILDLIFE AREA FOR ALL RESIDENTS WITH PATHS, LIGHTING, SEATS AND FACILITIES BOTH FOR CHILDREN'S PLAY AND OLDER TEENAGERS. THE TRUST HOLDS A 50 YEAR LEASE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Anne Leary | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Crossland | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN SHEARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD LLOYD PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENIFER ELIZABETH PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £404 | £2.77k | £0 | £11.26k | £1.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £547 | £377 | £1.08k | £1.22k | £1.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £700 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 OCTOBER 2005 as amended on 16 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
IN THORNTON, WYRE, LANCASHIRE ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THORNTON, WYRE, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 LAWSONS ROAD
THORNTON-CLEVELEYS
FY5 4DD
- Phone:
- 01253823516
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window