Accounts and annual returns THE T J VIRGO TRUST

Charity Number: 1116943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 August 2024 179 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 August 2024 178 days late
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 10 August 2022 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 August 2021 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 September 2020 On Time