THE WISHING TREE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to support therapeutic breaks for families at risk, and supporting those in need of a break for reasons of financial hardship or illness or disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER STEPHENSON MBE | Chair | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
VERA MARIA WATERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN LITTMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £120 | £120 | £120 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.12k | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 April 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 August 2024 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
OBJECT 1: UNDER THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958- TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH INDIVIDUALS. OBJECT 2: RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP- THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OF INDIVIDUALLY BY PROVIDING OR MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR, OR PROMOTING THOSE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BROOMFIELD HALL
ENMORE
BRIDGWATER
TA5 2DZ
- Phone:
- 01278671679
- Email:
- Robin@randrme.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window