MAIDEN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the people living, working and studying in Camden Central. To enter into partnerships with community and statutory providers with similar objectives to provide services throughout the Borough of Camden and adjacent Boroughs. To establish a Community Centre and to maintain and manage it for activities promoted by the Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £155,003 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- Islington
Governance
- 10 January 2006: Standard registration
- 27 February 2013: Funds received from 297129 MAIDEN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH HELEN POWELL | Chair | 06 November 2014 |
|
|||||||
Miriam Mannish | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Khedijah Ali Mohamed-Nur | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Fatima Yousuf | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Marian Larragy | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID MICHAEL SHARRATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
VALERIE AMAJOUTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN COWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £483.88k | £393.22k | £375.26k | £332.79k | £308.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £513.73k | £356.85k | £361.81k | £340.98k | £358.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £350.44k | £290.64k | £271.55k | £200.62k | £155.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
3.(I) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CAMDEN WARD THE AREA DESCRIBED AS FOLLOWS: BOUNDED BY YORK WAY, THE CANAL, ROYAL COLLEGE STREET CAMDEN ROAD, HEREINAFTER KNOWN AS THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT', WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR OF POLITICAL OPINION, RACE, COLOUR OR CREED BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3(II) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE), AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL OR STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL HAVE POWER TO AFFILIATE TO THE NATIONAL FEDERATION OF COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS AND TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS. 3(III) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE ASSOCIATION MAY: BRING TOGETHER IN CONFERENCE REPRESENTATIVES OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
CAMDEN WARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAIDEN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE
156 ST. PAULS CRESCENT
LONDON
NW1 9XZ
- Phone:
- 02072679586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window