ABC CHILDCARE (IPSWICH) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Care and Education for children mainly under statutory school age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 20 March 2006: Standard registration
- ABC PRE-SCHOOL (IPSWICH) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Gordon | Chair | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shakir Chowdhury | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Brundish | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Srikanth Konda | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ritwik Mangal | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Bennett | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel La-Mont | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Smith | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.15k | £170.13k | £202.21k | £204.81k | £219.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.87k | £192.91k | £200.07k | £202.32k | £244.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £104.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 MARCH 2009 as amended on 30 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: 3.1 OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; 3.2 ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; 3.3 INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. ST JOHNS
Contact information
- Address:
-
537 FOXHALL ROAD
IPSWICH
IP3 8LR
- Phone:
- 01473718296
- Email:
- admin@abcchildcare.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window