GOSLING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After school/holiday/breakfast club providing extended care for children from 4 - 11 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 05 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Tunley | Chair | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lambert | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Leader | Trustee | 02 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abegail Jane White | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.37k | £42.41k | £67.47k | £72.90k | £72.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.47k | £52.10k | £68.06k | £69.73k | £68.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.50k | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS CHILDCARE, EDUCATIONAL AND CHILD DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES 2. THESE ARE TO BE IN THE FORM OF A BREAKFAST CLUB, AFTER SCHOOL CLUB, AND HOLIDAY CLUB (WRAPAROUND PROVISION) 3. AIM TO PROVIDE A PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY 4. TO ADAPT AND PROVIDE ADDITIONAL CHILDCARE, EDUCATIONAL AND CHILD DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES AS DEEMED NECESSARY BY THE TRUSTEES. 5. TO USE ANY SURPLUS CAPITAL DEEMED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE PROVISION OF CHILDCARE, EDUCATION AND CHILD DEVELOPMENT IN THE PLYMSTOCK AREA IN THE FORM OF GRANTS AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION.
Area of benefit
PLYMSTOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Goosewell Academy
Furzehatt Villas
Plymstock
Plymouth
Devon
PL9 9HD
- Phone:
- 01752484360
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window