Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S CATHOLIC SCHOOL PTA, HIGH GREEN, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1113412
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required