Financial history BOLTON EDUCATION & WELFARE TRUST : AL-JAMIA TAHFEEZUL QURAN

Charity number: 1114346
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £96.74k £19.63k £66.24k £56.74k £70.68k
Total expenditure £52.44k £21.16k £50.63k £52.61k £38.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A