MRSA ACTION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support advice and information to patients, carers and dependants who are affected by MRSA and Healthcare Associated Infections (HAIs). Reviews and responds to consultations on guidelines and action for the prevention and control of HAIs. Works with the health economy, in prevention and control of HAIs and contributes to professional training programmes to ensure safe, quality healthcare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK BUTLER | Chair | 10 March 2007 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SPRATT | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA OWEN | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEVE OWEN | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BRONSTEIN | Trustee | 15 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARIA CANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN KNAPPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £476 | £728 | £390 | £3.29k | £90 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £910 | £1.37k | £515 | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY 1 THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION IN CONNECTION WITH THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF MRSA AND OTHER HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATED INFECTIONS. II THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO SUFFERERS OF MRSA AND OTHER HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATED INFECTIONS, THEIR CARERS AND THOSE BEREAVED AS A RESULT OF CONTRACTING SUCH INFECTIONS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF CLAUSE 3 THE TERM 'HEALTH CARE ASSOCIATED INFECTIONS' MEANS 'ANY INFECTION TO WHICH AN INDIVIDUAL MAY BE EXPOSED OR MADE SUSCEPTIBLE (OR MORE SUSCEPTIBLE) IN CIRCUMSTANCES WHERE A HEALTH CARE IS BEING, OR HAS BEEN PROVIDED TO THAT OR ANY OTHER INDIVIDUAL AND B THE RISK OF EXPOSURE TO THE INFECTION OR OF SUSCEPTIBILITY (OR INCREASED SUSCEPTIBILITY) TO IT IS DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY ATTRIBUTABLE TO THE PROVISION OF HEALTH CARE'. THIS DEFINITION IS TAKEN FROM PROPOSED LEGISLATION CONTAINED WITHIN THE HEALTH BILL (2006) WHICH IS CURRENTLY AWAITING ROYAL ASSENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 LUNESDALE ROAD
KIRKHAM
PRESTON
PR4 2HS
- Phone:
- 07762741114
- Email:
- info@mrsaactionuk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window