AHS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The funding and maintenance of medical facilities in the village of Noon Bagla, Pakistan serving the surrounding geographical area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 26 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NADEEM HAIDER SHAH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ASMA HASSAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AREF MOHAMMED | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD MARSH | Trustee |
|
||||||
RAHILA ABBAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TARIQ NAVID SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KARIM DIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.44k | £12.44k | £9.25k | £8.04k | £7.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.37k | £8.66k | £6.38k | £5.80k | £3.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC IN PAKISTAN - 1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE, FLOOD OR ANY OTHER DISASTER OR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE, IN PARTICULAR THOSE PERSONS AND COMMUNITIES ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY THE EARTHQUAKE IN NORTHERN PAKISTAN ON 8TH OCTOBER 2005; 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY BY THE DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATION HEALTH AND OTHER SOCIAL SERVICES, THE IMPROVEMENT OF TRANSPORT INFRASTRUCTURE, WATER SUPPLIES AND OTHER COMMUNAL FACILITIES AND THE PROMOTION OF SELF-HELP ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE PEOPLE OR COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 CAVENDISH COURT
SOUTH PARADE
DONCASTER
DN1 2DJ
- Phone:
- 08450941768
- Email:
- mshah@vigogroup.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window