THE VOCATIONAL LEARNING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Vocational Learning Trust has built a vocational learning centre called The Work Place. VOLT is responsible for ensuring the building is used for the aims and objectives of the Trust and also has a remit to raise funds for educational purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 07 February 2006: Standard registration
- VOLT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE RITCHIE MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Learmouth | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
LISA INGLEBY | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Elliott | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terence Stephenson | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Ann McDonnell | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bernard McGarry | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|||||
ANDREW GILMORE | Trustee | 23 January 2007 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.38k | £199.40k | £113.37k | £110.38k | £111.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.66k | £189.80k | £113.74k | £102.68k | £95.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN VOCATIONAL AND APPLIED SUBJECTS AND MATHS AND SCIENCE PRIMARILY FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND AND YORKSHIRE TO HELP THEM UNDERSTAND THE INTER RELATIONSHIPS OF THESE SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE IN THE WORK PLACE.
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE AND NORTH EAST ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WORK PLACE
HEIGHINGTON LANE
AYCLIFFE INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 6AH
- Phone:
- 01325375900
- Email:
- info@twpa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window