Financial history IRISH ELDERLY ADVICE NETWORK

Charity number: 1115711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £157.07k £260.26k £260.85k £343.83k £302.67k
Total expenditure £154.87k £251.32k £264.23k £311.90k £292.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £37.50k N/A N/A