BOB POTTER CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of patients residing with 2 20 mile radius of Frimley Park Hospital, Frimley, Camberley, Surrey receiving treatment at that hospital or on their discharge who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped, infirm or in need of financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN MARY GOODEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOB BOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA VERA LEITCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BOB POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £4.28k | £714 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
4.1 THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS RESIDING WITHIN A TWENTY MILE RADIUS OF FRIMLEY PARK HOSPITAL FRIMLEY CAMBERLEY SURREY RECEIVING TREATMENT AT THAT HOSPITAL OR ON THEIR DISCHARGE WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT DISABLED HANDICAPPED INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE 4.2 THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR RECREATIONAL FACILITIES OF SUCH PATIENTS 4.3 THE RELIEF IN CASES OF FINANCIAL DISTRESS OF THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PATIENTS OR OF DECEASED PATIENTS 4.4 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ILLNESSES AND DISEASES WHICH ARE DEALT WITH AT THE SAID FRIMLEY PARK HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
FRIMLEY, CAMBERLEY, SURREY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 Wharf Road
Frimley Green
Camberley
GU16 6PW
- Phone:
- 07770737377
- Email:
- KAREN@LAKESIDEINTHOTEL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window