THE ALLIANCE FOR BLACK CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activities are: Providing themed holiday activities, fishing club to develop social, cultural and educational skills. Family support via referrals from statutory organisations, self referrals for ages 0 - 19 years. Study support for children aged 8 -13 in schools in Wellingborough. Community events -participation on multi-agency forums including Local Area Agreement locality group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 February 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 12 September 2006: Standard registration
- 09 May 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ABC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/02/2008 | 07/02/2009 | 07/02/2010 | 07/02/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.94k | £163.82k | £200.78k | £186.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.22k | £160.40k | £174.55k | £200.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 07 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 07 February 2011 | 29 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2011 | 09 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 07 February 2010 | 29 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 February 2010 | 08 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 MAY 2006 AND 7 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF AFRICAN/CARIBBEAN ORIGIN; AND (II) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS BY ENDEAVOURING TO RAISE LEVELS OF TOLERANCE THROUGH PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND EXPLANATION OF AFRICAN/CARIBBEAN CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window