RECYCLING EDUCATION ALLOWING DEVELOPMENT INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We deliver collaborative, student led initiatives to improve access to education across the world and increase youth participation in the global community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 18 May 2006: Standard registration
- 11 November 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 11 November 2011: Funds transferred to 1128534 READ PROJECTS
- READ INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.75k | £173.70k | £222.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.46k | £126.56k | £300.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | 10 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | 09 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 24 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 24 June 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 19 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
3(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN TANZANIA BY THE PROVISION OF BOOKS AND OTHER TEACHING MATERIALS. 3(II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ON ISSUES OF POVERTY IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN TANZANIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window