Sevenoaks Sea Cadets - Unit 631

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sea Cadet unit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 06 April 2006: Standard registration
- T S GALLANT (Working name)
- WESTERHAM UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Anne Child | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elizabeth Paimer | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Money | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Saving | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Worth | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rudland | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Child | Trustee | 14 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Belton | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.96k | £403 | £15.01k | £13.08k | £8.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.02k | £8.17k | £3.86k | £9.09k | £12.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GOVERNING DOCUMENT IS THE SEA CADET REGULATIONS as amended on 27 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
SURREY & KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chipstead Sailing Club
Chevening Road
Chipstead
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN13 2SD
- Phone:
- 07946301072
- Email:
- info@sevenoaksscc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window