Trustees THE YATELEY AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity Number: 1113027

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Smith | Chair | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Krystyna Cozens | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Chegwidden | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Matthews | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Chegwidden Ms | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilde Bartlett | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Norman | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Murillo | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Cox | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Frost | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Prewer | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.