Trustees CHILLI STUDIOS (NEWCASTLE AND GATESHEAD ARTS STUDIO) LIMITED

Charity number: 1116957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Bell Trustee 07 April 2025
None on record
Thomas William Lonsdale Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Dr Toby Brandon Trustee 11 September 2019
None on record
JOHN BANKS Trustee 21 December 2017
None on record
NIKKI GIBBARD Trustee 18 October 2017
None on record
ALISDAIR STEWART CAMERON Trustee
MENTAL HEALTH NORTH EAST LIMITED
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
DOUGLAS HUNTER Trustee
None on record