ROTJANAS HANDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CONTINUED EQUIPPING AND MAINTAINING OF THE ORPHANAGE AND ONGOING CARE OF THE CHILDREN. THE CONTINUED HOUSING OF 101 CHILDREN. THESE CHILDREN HAVE SUFFERED ABUSE OR ILLNESS AND ARE UNABLE TO LIVE WITH THEIR FAMILIES. SOME OF THE CHILDREN ARE STILL ORIGINAL TSUNAMI ORPHANS. PROVIDE FUNDING FOR EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THE CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Scotland
- Thailand
Governance
- 30 March 2006: Standard registration
- 07 April 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HATW (Working name)
- HANDS ACROSS THE WATER (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.67k | £1.85k | £4.08k | £950 | £752 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.87k | £9.84k | £4.76k | £1.02k | £690 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 MARCH 2006. AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ORPHANAGE FOR THE CHILDREN OF BAAN PRU-TEAW, THAILAND.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window