THE FRIENDS OF TIPTREE HEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A co-ordinated programme of conservation management of the site by volunteers, contractors and Essex Wildlife Trust staff to meet Natural England requirements for restoration of valuable heathland with SSSI status. Regular Wildlife Discovery educational activities are offered for both children and adults in the local community. Weekly Health Walks are led by trained volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 03 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Bundy | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Coleman | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Norah Pinch | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Clifford Beckett | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Helen Eastbrook | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MARY WEBB | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUZANNE MARIAN MORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA CHILDS CERT ED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL PENNICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.58k | £1.06k | £1.24k | £1.34k | £12.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £17.32k | £5.21k | £7.33k | £6.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 19 JULY 2006 AND 11 JULY 2007 as amended on 31 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
1 TO RESTORE AND CONSERVE, OR ASSIST IN THE CONSERVATION OF, THE NATURAL BEAUTY AND SPECIAL VALUE OF TIPTREE HEATH AS RARE LOWLAND HEATH AND SITE OF SPECIAL SCIENTIFIC INTEREST (SSSI) AND TO PROTECT AND IMPROVE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROTECTION OF ITS AMENITIES. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN, IN THE IMPORTANCE OF THE LOCAL ENVIRONMENT, ECOLOGY AND TIPTREE HEATH.
Area of benefit
TIPTREE HEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
165 Maldon Road
Tiptree
COLCHESTER
CO5 0PN
- Phone:
- 07546365316
- Email:
- joanpinch@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window