THE ZOOM ZOOM TRUST

Charity Number: 1112924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Zoom Zoom Trust is a small family trust making donations to religious activities, relief of poverty and general charitable purposes. It is a Private Charitable Trust. Speculative approaches are never entertained.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £126,500
Total expenditure: £101,068

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Liverpool City
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK STEVEN MITCHELL Chair
GRACE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DENISE ROBERTS Trustee 19 September 2011
None on record
DAVID ROBERTS Trustee 19 September 2011
None on record
Anita Mitchell Trustee
None on record
Michael Donnan Trustee
MRS AGNES PARKER HOUGHTON
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
WIRRAL FOODBANK
Received: On time
WIRRAL FOODBANK
Received: On time
DR PENNY'S FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, HESWALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £172.55k £196.96k £350 £13.30k £126.50k
Total expenditure £126.25k £99.73k £83.67k £166.62k £101.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WILLASTON GRANGE
HADLOW ROAD
WILLASTON
NESTON
CH64 2UN
Phone:
01513271234
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available