BUSTAN E ZAHRA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Shia Ashari Faith in a manner which is harmonious with the entire wider community of the UK. To offer support to those in our community who are in spiritual or material need. to support emergeny relief funds worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
- Slough
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMED RAFIC PADHANI | Chair | 27 April 2006 |
|
|
||||
rukhsana hasham | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Farhan Jamal | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Syed Irtiza Haider | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARZIAH ERUM PADHANI | Trustee | 08 December 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/04/2020 | 25/04/2021 | 25/04/2022 | 25/04/2023 | 25/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.04k | £74.64k | £168.25k | £225.64k | £359.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.91k | £64.99k | £134.60k | £205.02k | £335.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 April 2023 | 10 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2023 | 10 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2022 | 24 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 April 2021 | 22 August 2022 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2021 | 22 August 2022 | 178 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 April 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2020 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED AT A GENERAL MEETING DATED 28 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SHIA JAFARI ITHNA ASHARI FAITH (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM WOMEN IN GOOD CITIZENSHIP, HANDICRAFTS AND HOME ECONOMICS. (C) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY BETWEEN PERSONS OF THE SHIA JAFARI ITHNA ASHARI FAITH AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
877 HARROW ROAD
WEMBLEY
HA0 2RH
- Phone:
- 0208 9084911
- Email:
- MahmoodPadhani@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window