Accounts and annual returns ST PETER'S (WINSTANLEY) CHILDREN'S CENTRE LTD

Charity Number: 1116784
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 28 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 28 May 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 10 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 23 December 2014 On Time