ST PETER'S (WINSTANLEY) CHILDREN'S CENTRE LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY IS A CHILDREN'S CENTRE. THE MAIN INCOME COMES FROM FEES FROM RUNNING A 52 PLACE FULL DAY CARE NURSERY FOR PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN ALONGSIDE OTHER FAMILY AND CHILDREN CENTRED ACTIVITIES- THIS IS FOCUSSED IN WANDSWORTH, SW LONDON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 14 November 2006: Standard registration
- 22 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £477.16k | £384.85k | £169.87k | £33.24k | £16 | |
|
Total expenditure | £597.25k | £498.81k | £141.18k | £139.52k | £26.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 31 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 28 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 28 May 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 10 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 23 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A DAY NURSERY FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN WHO ARE BELOW SCHOOL AGE (5 YEARS OLD) IN THE AREA OF WANDSWORTH.
Area of benefit
WANDSWORTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window