CORNWALL HOSPICE CARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cornwall Hospice Care provides help and relief to people suffering from cancer and other life threatening illnesses by providing and promoting specialist palliative care to the people of Cornwall and the Isles of Scilly. The charity achieves this by providing In Patient and Out Patient specialist palliative care at its two hospices, Mount Edgcumbe Hospice,St Austell and St Julia's Hospice,Hayle
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£11,777,084
Donations and legacies | £3.18m | |
Charitable activities | £1.16m | |
Other trading activities | £7.01m | |
Investments | £231.56k | |
Other | £197.20k |
Total expenditure:
£11,690,756
Raising funds | £4.67m | |
Charitable activities | £6.88m | |
Other | £141.06k |
£200,159 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,158,109 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.82m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.88m | |
Retained for future use | £86.33k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.82m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.88m | |
Retained for future use | £286.49k |
People

274 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- CORNWALL HOSPICE CARE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin John Davis | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominique Roberts | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bamford | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Thomas | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Godzicz | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Charles Naylor | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Piercy | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Stubberfield | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR JAMES WHYTE | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin John Philip | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ANN CLARKE | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|||||
David Renwick | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steve Hawkins | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.31m | £9.67m | £11.30m | £12.52m | £11.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.98m | £10.14m | £10.32m | £11.08m | £11.69m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.17m | £1.44m | £1.06m | £1.10m | £1.16m | |
|
Income from government grants | £487.40k | £3.25m | £335.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.86m | £2.22m | £4.25m | £4.94m | £3.18m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.46m | £2.46m | £4.73m | £6.14m | £7.01m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.17m | £1.44m | £1.06m | £1.10m | £1.16m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £106.82k | £121.19k | £93.56k | £99.92k | £231.56k | |
|
Income - Other | £228.07k | £3.43m | £248.10k | £237.93k | £197.20k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.43m | £1.67m | £3.72m | £4.48m | £2.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.91m | £6.11m | £6.40m | £6.63m | £6.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.97m | £3.93m | £3.92m | £4.30m | £4.67m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £91.90k | £0 | £0 | £141.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £22.36k | £21.13k | £28.01k | £29.24k | £29.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £95.82k | £102.63k | £0 | £148.09k | £141.06k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.43m | £4.31m | £4.18m | £4.14m | £4.02m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.41m | £3.61m | £4.82m | £4.61m | £4.87m | |
|
Other assets | £2.01m | £1.81m | £1.83m | £3.53m | £3.67m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £713.88k | £639.07k | £731.83k | £1.01m | £993.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 DECEMBER 2005 as amended on 19 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE HELP AND RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND OTHER LIFE THREATENING ILLNESSES AND THE PROVISION AND PROMOTION OF SPECIALIST AND PALLIATIVE CARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOUNT EDGCUMBE HOSPICE
PORTHPEAN ROAD
ST. AUSTELL
PL26 6AB
- Phone:
- 0172665711
- Email:
- whood1@cornwallhospice.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window