EYE AID FOR AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EYE SURGERY & EXAMINATIONS, SUPPLY OF GLASSES & OTHER AIDS,SUPPLY OF DRUGS FOR TREATMENT OF EYE CONDITIONS. ALSO SUPPLY OF OPTOMETRIC EQUIPMENT AND GLAZING EQUIPMENT. RELIEF OF POOR. IN 2008 PAID FOR SURGERY IN UK FOR BOY WITH MALIGNANT BRAIN TUMOUR AFFECTING SIGHT AND ONGOING TREATMENT UNTIL DISCHARGED IN JUNE 2013. HELPING SUPPORT EYE CLINIC NEAR KUMASI AND CHILDREN AT THE SCHOOL FOR THE BLIND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ghana
Governance
- 08 February 2006: Standard registration
- 17 January 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EAA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.36k | £13.04k | £13.47k | £10.64k | £20.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.65k | £18.00k | £2.00k | £24.72k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
3.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIMES, IN SUCH MANNER, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR OR TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND IN PARTICULAR BY 3.1.1 PROVIDING EYE CARE TO PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM EYE DISEASE IN AFRICA 3.1.2 THE STUDY OF THE CAUSES AND THE SEARCH FOR WAYS TO REDUCE BLINDNESS IN AFRICA. 3.1.3 THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND CONSUMABLES FOR THE RELIEF OF BLINDNESS AND REFRACTIVE ERRORS AND THE CURE OF EYE DISEASE 3.1.4 COLLABORATING WITH OTHER NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS IN ORGANISING OPHTHALMIC SURGICAL AND MEDICAL CAMPAIGNS 3.1.5 RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES OF EYE CARE IN AFRICA 3.1.6 ANY OTHER ACTIVITY THAT CONTRIBUTES TO IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE BLIND IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.