CYPRIOT COMMUNITY CENTRE OF THE ASSOCIATION OF CYPRIOT ORGANISATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, education/training, disability, arts/culture, sport/recreation. Provision of the above services to the Cypriot community in the Barnet, Enfield, Hackney, Haringey and Islington areas (of London).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£716,665
Donations and legacies | £45.28k | |
Charitable activities | £669.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.13k | |
Other | £1.25k |
Total expenditure:
£696,486
Raising funds | £324.56k | |
Charitable activities | £350.38k | |
Other | £21.54k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,800 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £346.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £350.38k | |
Retained for future use | £20.18k |
People

19 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 18 January 2006: Standard registration
- 08 April 2020: Funds received from 1039615 CYPRIOT ELDERLY AND DISABLED GROUP
- CCC (Working name)
- CYPRIOT CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSIE CONSTANTINIDES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE THEODOULOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BAMBOS CHARALAMBOUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FOTINI TSIOUPRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREAS GEORGIOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUNUR EGEMENSOY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEMETRIS GEORGIOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERGUN KILIC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NINA STYLIANOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREAS SAVVIDES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gokay Ucar | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £522.20k | £515.22k | £612.73k | £632.55k | £716.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £502.54k | £488.41k | £566.27k | £683.02k | £696.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.27k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.50k | £270.18k | £154.80k | N/A | £14.80k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £105.66k | £11.37k | £45.10k | £14.39k | £45.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £415.70k | £503.38k | £567.61k | £616.84k | £669.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £61 | £27 | £14 | £458 | £1.13k | |
|
Income - Other | £783 | £438 | £0 | £860 | £1.25k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £245.39k | £249.57k | £566.27k | £369.54k | £350.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £257.15k | £0 | £0 | £293.11k | £324.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £108.66k | £111.10k | £128.47k | £148.96k | £156.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £238.84k | £0 | £20.37k | £21.54k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £287.54k | £308.13k | £288.23k | £306.84k | £320.92k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £197.75k | £176.36k | £234.93k | £176.44k | £191.78k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £54.68k | £27.06k | £20.80k | £31.40k | £40.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF MAINLY THE CYPRIOT COMMUNITY RESIDING OR WORKING WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE GREATER LONDON AREA AND PARTICULARLY THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARINGEY (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE SERVICES, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (II) TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE CYPRIOT COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO COOPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON, IN PARTICULAR HARINGEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
CYPRIOT COMMUNITY CENTRE
EARLHAM GROVE
LONDON
N22 5HJ
- Phone:
- 02088812329
- Email:
- cs@cypriotcentre.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window