Financial history THE SHANNON BRADSHAW TRUST

Charity Number: 1113368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.30k £2.22k £8.43k £35.61k £22.02k
Total expenditure £19.20k £7.76k £6.64k £14.22k £21.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A