Financial history SEVEN STORIES, THE NATIONAL CENTRE FOR CHILDREN'S BOOKS COLLECTION TRUST

Charity Number: 1115167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.46k £250.20k £939.51k £813.76k £80.91k
Total expenditure £1.71k £1.71k £1.74k £1.67k £2.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £939.50k £813.75k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £15 £12 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.74k £1.67k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £1.60k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A