SEVEN STORIES, THE NATIONAL CENTRE FOR CHILDREN'S BOOKS COLLECTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity owns a collection of modern and contemporary British children's books and related original artwork, manuscripts and archives. The charity makes the collection available to Seven Stories, The National Centre for Children's Books (registered charity 1056812) for use in exhibitions, educational activities, research and other programmes, for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 July 2006: Standard registration
- SEVEN STORIES, THE NATIONAL CENTRE FOR CHILDREN'S BOOKS (Previous name)
- THE CENTRE FOR CHILDREN'S BOOKS COLLECTION TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Thomas McWhinnie | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Layfield | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Matthew Grenby | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hammill | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.46k | £250.20k | £939.51k | £813.76k | £80.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £1.71k | £1.74k | £1.67k | £2.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £939.50k | £813.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £15 | £12 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.74k | £1.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.60k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED ON 15 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ARTS AND LITERATURE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF BRITAIN'S LITERARY HERITAGE FOR CHILDREN AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PRESERVING, MAINTAINING AND ADDING TO THE COLLECTION AND BY PROMOTING ACCESS TO THE COLLECTION. 3.2 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE COLLECTION IN TRUST FOR THE OBJECTS STRICTLY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS AND CONDITIONS OF THIS DEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEVEN STORIES
THE CENTRE FOR CHILDRENS BOOKS
30 LIME STREET
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 2PQ
- Phone:
- 08452710777
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window