Accounts and annual returns KAPA FOUNDATION FOR INTERNATIONAL MUSIC DEVELOPMENT

Charity Number: 1112754
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 September 2019 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 15 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 15 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required