Trustees BRENTFORD FC COMMUNITY SPORTS TRUST
Charity Number: 1112784

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN DOBIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Modi Abdoul | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Iain Preston | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharon Wright | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nityajit Raj | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcella Eileen Phelan | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN GAMMON | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anita Ralli | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KARL ADRIAN REYNOLDS | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LAWRENCE CUDMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD GILBERT KERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN ROBERT BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.