Accounts and annual returns SCHOOL FUND FOR QUEEN ELEANOR PRIMARY

Charity number: 1112795
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 18 February 2013 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required