CEDP CHINESE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing free educational advice. Organising monthly gatherings, Chinese festive events. Providing English language and cultural awareness training opportunities for people of Chinese origins. Providing Chinese language and cultural awareness training courses for non-Chinese people. Chinese Day at schools, After-school Chinese Clubs have been established around East and West Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
- China
Governance
- 27 March 2007: Standard registration
- CEDP (Working name)
- CHINESE EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HONG LU | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Aijuan Wang | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zhenchuan Hong | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Theobald | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Guocheng Zhang | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ling Ren | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZHEN QIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr YU SUN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAOZHEN WU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WEIQIAN TIAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.67k | £19.43k | £48.88k | £29.11k | £2.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.87k | £25.59k | £18.19k | £28.27k | £15.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | £14.73k | £31.78k | £8.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 APRIL 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS THE OBJECT OF THE CEDP IS TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN BRIGHTON AND HOVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ESTABLISHING AND SUPPORTING PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER VOLUNTEERS, VOLUNTEER ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER RELATED SERVICES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND FURTHER OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. ("THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
IN BRIGHTON AND HOVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
B M E C P Centre
10a Fleet Street
BRIGHTON
BN1 4ZE
- Phone:
- 07970338818
- Email:
- info@cedp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window