HELP THE POOR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds and distribute these funds in UK charities and other overseas charities in Africa, India. Donate worldwide at the time of natural disaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 27 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie Devjani Lala Clarke | Chair |
|
|
|||||
UDAY SANKAR DAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KABITA LALA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHITTA RANJAN CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.39k | £5.10k | £817 | £4.49k | £7.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.45k | £4.22k | £110 | £5.00k | £6.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 March 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE FUNDS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF MOTHER TERESA'S HOME AT KOLKATA (MISSIONARIES OF CHARITY) BUT THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION (PROVIDED THEY ARE IN UNANIMOUS AGREEMENT) APPLY THE FUNDS TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY UK REGISTERED CHARITY AND ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR BODY IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
KOLKATA AND WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
146 SEVERN DRIVE
UPMINSTER
RM14 1PW
- Phone:
- 01708941909
- Email:
- barbellera@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window