JUMPING BEANS GARRATT PARK PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charitiy's principal activities are to provide educational activities to pre-school children in a caring and family orientated environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 23 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Lawson | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phylicia Cameron | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shakeira Lawson | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.55k | £57.83k | £33.22k | £60.22k | £49.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.63k | £75.43k | £58.59k | £83.66k | £86.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 March 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 423 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 423 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
* TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 11 PRIMARILY FROM AND IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH (THE AREA OF BENEFIT). * TO ADVANCE PARENTING SKILLS. * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATION FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARRATT PARK ONE O'CLOCK CENTRE
SIWARD ROAD
LONDON
SW17 0LA
- Phone:
- 07503994183
- Email:
- p.selley@clara.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window