Accounts and annual returns SLAM COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1114612
Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 February 2022 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 February 2022 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 January 2021 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 January 2021 92 days late Download Open in new window