Governing document SAXON WEALD HOMES LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/04/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 08/11/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE (A) TO PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING, OTHER HOUSING, ACCOMMODATION AND ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, SERVICES AND AMENITIES FOR POOR PEOPLE AND FOR THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY, DISABLED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY OR LEARNING DISABLED) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; AND (B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT NOT PROHIBITED FOR A COMPANY REGISTERED WITH THE REGULATOR AS A PRIVATE REGISTERED PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF HORSHAM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.