BARNSLEY METRODOME INDOOR BOWLING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote foster and safeguard the game of level green indoor bowls
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 04 April 2006: Standard registration
- 11 May 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.36k | £48.35k | £28.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.80k | £29.27k | £29.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 05 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 05 February 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 10 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 20 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 12 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 12 November 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING INDOOR BOWLS. 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. BARNSLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window