BHAGWAN SHREE LAKSHMI NARAYAN DHAM (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold seminars & conferences (samagams) on regular basis in the UK and Europe. Seminars are held to enable people to learn about the secrets of cosmic science & to promote Women health awareness worldwide. Telecast of programmes based on teachings of Hindu religion. Providing counselling sessions which includes realisation of self-empowerment in health, prosperity and inner peace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 2006: Standard registration
- BHAGWAN SHREE LAKSHAMI NARAYAN DHAM (UK) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sanjeev Sharma | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohanbhai Mistry | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NAVIN PAL | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.66k | £172.85k | £188.85k | £149.16k | £106.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £243.02k | £173.39k | £137.16k | £263.02k | £128.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 October 2022 | 455 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 October 2022 | 455 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2019
(These accounts |
26 November 2020 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE TENETS OF KUNDAN LAL, THE BRAHM RISHI KUMAR SWAMI, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE PROVISION OF TEMPLES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR MEETINGS, WORSHIP AND PRAYER AND THE DUE PERFORMANCE OF RITES ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF SUCH RELIGION; (B) THE SUPPORT AND MAINTENANCE OF, AND THE PROVISION OF RESIDENCES FOR, PRIESTS; (C) TEACHING AND EDUCATING BOTH FOLLOWERS OF AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE DOCTRINES AND PRACTICES OF SAID RELIGION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF SUCH RELIGION PROVIDE, OR MAKE PROVISION FOR, ORPHANAGES, AND FOR THE ACCOMMODATION OF THE AGED, AND PROVIDE, OR MAKE PROVISION FOR, HEALTH AND ADVICE CENTRES FOR THOSE IN NEED THEREOF, AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF THE POOR AND THE NEEDY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Paddocks
Windsor Road
Water Oakley
WINDSOR
SL4 5UJ
- Phone:
- 01628628683
- Email:
- bslnd@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window