REHABILITATION RESPONSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training courses, humanitarian aid and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Zafar Khan MBE | Chair | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mubashshar Ahmad | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Muhammad Ilyas Khan | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD ARIF SHAHAB | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHAHBUX LASHARI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr AMJAD GULZAR SHAIKH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/09/2019 | 20/09/2020 | 20/09/2021 | 20/09/2022 | 20/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.36k | £75.17k | £10.27k | £33.17k | £79.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.27k | £103.03k | £2.63k | £13.44k | £74.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 September 2021 | 17 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 September 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 September 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 September 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE RESIDING PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DEVELOPING COUNTRIES OF ASIA AND AFRICA BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PRIMARILY BUT MOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE DEVELOPING COUNTRIES OF ASIA AND AFRICA. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE PARTICULARLY BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
231B Old Brompton Road
LONDON
SW5 0EA
- Phone:
- 02073732219
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window