CASTLE GATE FAMILY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Castle Gate Family Trust is a family centre offering a range of facilities to support Gloucestershire families of inmates serving a sentance in any Prison.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 April 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 April 2006: Standard registration
- 02 January 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/04/2008 | 24/04/2009 | 24/04/2010 | 24/04/2011 | 24/04/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.99k | £133.26k | £131.61k | £99.24k | £125.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.15k | £121.29k | £141.24k | £138.92k | £130.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 April 2012 | 24 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 April 2012 | 24 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 24 April 2011 | 20 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 April 2011 | 20 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 24 April 2010 | 07 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 April 2010 | 10 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 24 April 2009 | 12 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 April 2009 | 12 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 24 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF WIVES, PARTNERS, FAMILIES, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION OF THEIR LIBERTY, AND WHO ARE DETAINED AT HM PRISON GLOUCESTER, BARRACK SQUARE, GLOUCESTER AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE MAINTENANCE OF A VISITORS CENTRE OFFERING ADVICE AND INFORMATION SERVICES AND PLAY FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRISONERS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE MAINTENANCE OF FAMILY TIES AND RELATIONSHIPS DURING THE INCARCERATION OF A MEMBER OF THE FAMILY AT THE ABOVE MENTIONED PRISON
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window