Financial history KITAID

Charity number: 1113968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.46k £16.65k £12.07k £22.30k £20.14k
Total expenditure £9.46k £13.60k £17.40k £18.03k £21.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A