THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH HEDGERLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
2007 Heating oil storage tank replaced with modern tank, bunded, to conform with regulations Replace cast-iron down-pipes Clean/renovate gutters. 2008 Clean, inspect Chancel roof for damp 2009 Clean, repair tiles 2011 Repaired coping stones and kneeler on roof 2009-2011 Made new paved path with some bricks engraved for donors 2011 Creating new website for The Friends of St Mary's Hedgerley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 07 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT FRANCIS NEEDS GRAZEBROOK | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY LANE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £430 | £260 | £325 | £260 | £260 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.37k | £0 | £1.10k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2023 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 November 2023 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2023 | 1096 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY, HEDGERLEY, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND THE CHURCHYARD WITH THE FENCES, HEDGES AND GATES THERETO.
Area of benefit
HEDGERLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARM COTTAGE
COLLINSWOOD ROAD
FARNHAM COMMON
SLOUGH
SL2 3LJ
- Phone:
- 01753643187
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window