LIGHTHOUSE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES (UPC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It is engaged in the worship of God and the furtherance of the gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ and the general advancement of the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Newham
Governance
- 01 March 2006: Standard registration
- LMC (UPC) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Emile Austin | Trustee |
|
||||||
CORAL MARIA COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDESIRI MAUREEN ERUENAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVEREND COLIN NICOLAS DOWDIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.31k | £66.54k | £75.36k | £88.17k | £99.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.71k | £53.56k | £59.76k | £65.41k | £77.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 February 2023 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 February 2023 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 December 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 December 2020 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
ISLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
249 High Street
Stratford
London
E15 2LS
- Phone:
- 07932471782
- Email:
- lcmstratford@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window